Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Booth, Billy L, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Fabrikant, Kevin H., against Konell, Samuel, North Shore Med Ctr, Sanchez, Erick, Southern Winds Hospital, Tenet Health System North Shore Inc, (total of 12) See All represented by Fabrikant, Kevin H., Scott L Mendlestein, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Samantha Ruiz Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2005 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is a motion for leave to amend the sixth amended complaint to add a claim for punitive damages. The plaintiff, Billy L. Booth, seeks to add a claim for punitive damages against the defendant, Tenet Health System North Shore, Inc., d/b/...
Order of Dismissal
Date: February 26, 2016Order of Dismissal
Date: January 18, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: February 02, 2016Memorandum
Date: February 01, 2016Order on Motion to Compel
Date: December 16, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: December 18, 2015Response:
Date: January 21, 2016Order:
Date: January 26, 2016Response:
Date: December 18, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 12, 2015Motion:
Date: October 01, 2015Motion:
Date: February 03, 2016Order:
Date: February 03, 2016Response:
Date: January 07, 2016Order:
Date: January 13, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: September 29, 2015Response:
Date: September 25, 2015Response:
Date: September 24, 2015Memorandum of Law
Date: January 19, 2016Response:
Date: January 07, 2016Letter of Correspondence
Date: January 04, 2016Motion:
Date: December 18, 2015Response:
Date: December 15, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: December 07, 2015Response:
Date: September 16, 2015Motion in Limine
Date: September 24, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 18, 2015Order:
Date: September 21, 2015Motion:
Date: September 30, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 23, 2015Response:
Date: September 14, 2015Motion:
Date: August 19, 2015Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: September 29, 2015Motion for Continuance
Date: October 01, 2015Motion in Limine
Date: September 30, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: September 29, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: September 25, 2015Objection:
Date: September 25, 2015Order:
Date: September 09, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: August 26, 2015Order:
Date: August 24, 2015Request:
Date: September 13, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 18, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: September 11, 2015Request:
Date: July 09, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 08, 2015Motion to Shorten Time
Date: September 14, 2015Request:
Date: September 11, 2015Motion:
Date: July 09, 2015Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: July 09, 2015Response:
Date: September 03, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 16, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 31, 2015Motion:
Date: August 28, 2015Request:
Date: August 27, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: August 11, 2015Response:
Date: June 08, 2015Motion:
Date: August 13, 2015Request for Production
Date: August 19, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 14, 2015Order on Motion to Compel
Date: July 29, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 28, 2015Response:
Date: August 18, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: July 20, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 19, 2015Motion:
Date: April 15, 2015Motion:
Date: April 08, 2015Notice Or Stipulation Designating Mediator
Date: February 27, 2015Order:
Date: February 22, 2015Order of Referral to Mediation Unit
Date: February 05, 2015Order:
Date: July 29, 2015Order on Motion to Compel
Date: July 06, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: May 08, 2015Order on Motion to Compel
Date: June 22, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: July 17, 2015Order:
Date: July 16, 2015Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: July 03, 2015Order on Motion to Compel
Date: June 22, 2015Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: June 26, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 02, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: June 11, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: June 08, 2015Order to Show Cause
Date: May 20, 2015Request:
Date: May 21, 2015Notice of Appeal
Date: June 09, 2010Order on Motion to Compel
Date: June 04, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 05, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: April 30, 2015Motion:
Date: May 07, 2015Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: April 03, 2015Order:
Date: April 22, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 20, 2015Motion:
Date: April 02, 2015Order:
Date: December 08, 2014Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 02, 2015Motion to Withdraw
Date: May 27, 2014Order Taxing Cost
Date: September 28, 2011Summary Final Judgment
Date: July 27, 2011Order of Referral to Mediation Unit
Date: February 04, 2015Notice of Appeal
Date: June 03, 2010Mot to File Amended Complaint
Date: February 12, 2014Mot to File Amended Complaint
Date: August 04, 2014Response:
Date: December 02, 2014Final Judgment
Date: May 05, 2010Notice of Appeal
Date: January 04, 2010Notice of Appeal
Date: June 06, 2008Mandate From Appeals Court
Date: March 11, 2011Order:
Date: August 19, 2015Order:
Date: September 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: North Shore Med Ctr Inc; North Shore Med Ctr |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: North Shore Med Ctr |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO SEVER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER OF JULY 29TH, 2015. GRANTED DENIED IN PART Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 03, 2016 | Hearing |
5 Minute Motion Calendar Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: North Shore Med Ctr |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF PLT BILLY BOOTH'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING DEFT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.