Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vaccaro, Mariangela, Vaccaro, Nicola, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Montes, Juan C, against State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2005 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Order of Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Eligible for Destruction : 02/02/2014 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B: 26554 P: 4444 STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Text DEFTS STATE FARM AUTO INS COMPANY'S AMENDED PRE-TRIAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition RE-NOTICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO BE EXCUSED FROM THE FIRST WEEK OF TRIAL PERIOD Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- MOTIONS 07/23/2008 10:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Text DEF'S COMPLIANCE W/ORDER OF PRETRIAL CONF. Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.