Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vidal, Rosadela, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) case represented by Edson, Laurence J., against Estevez, Zayra N, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2005 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint (Non-Monetary) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.)
Date: August 29, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Eligible for Destruction : 11/08/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 23731 P: 4373 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Estevez Zayra N |
|
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) B: 23731 P: 4373 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
No Service Calendar 08/18/2005 01:30 PM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Text CASE TRANSFERRED FR CIRCUIT OLD #04-27089CA08 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Complaint $ 0.00 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.