Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Knablin, John M Jr, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategorySummary Administration |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text WILL NOT ADMITTED, PLACED ON DEPOSIT' Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Record Center Box 21-1113 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Request TO PROBATE DIVISION FROM EQUISEARCH Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Mailed 1 PLAIN COPY OF THE ENTIRE FILE TO EQUISEARCH Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Final Order J $ 0.00 BK:23830 PG:2891 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Knablin John M Sr |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memorandum EX PARTE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Death Certificate JOHN MARTIN KNABLIN, JR. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition: TO DISMISS PETT FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Pending Will Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition for Summary Administration B: 23057 P: 2059 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.