Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Southerland, S Duane, filed a(n) Other Civil Complaint case against Equality Specialties Inc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2005 |
CategoryOther Civil Complaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: January 17, 2017Final Judgment
Date: January 04, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order A/O 16-12 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Eligible for Destruction : 02/08/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice and Judgment Mailed Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Registered Mail 77004148292000006451 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment J $ 77964.29 BK:22978 PG:4547 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Equality Specialties Inc |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Recorded Document B: 22978 P: 4549 AFFIDAVIT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment by Judge Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.