Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Academy Roofing & Street Metal Co, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Cellucrete Corp, Fidelity & Deposit Co Of Maryland, North American Specialty Ins Co, Safeco Ins Co Of America, Suffolk Construction Co Inc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2005 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 09, 2005Voluntary Dismissal
Date: October 13, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Eligible for Destruction : 11/08/2010 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer ATTORNEY:88888888 TO 1ST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Cellucrete Corp |
|
October 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 23882 P: 4999 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Cellucrete Corp; North American Specialty Ins Co |
|
October 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 23882 P: 4999 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Process NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO 7/28/05 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 23680 P: 0022 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Suffolk Construction Co Inc; Fidelity & Deposit Co Of Maryland; Safeco Ins Co Of America; Xl Speciality Ins Co |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal B: 23680 P: 0022 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Process NORTH AMERICIAN SPECIALTY INS. - SERVED 7/28/05 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Text 1ST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order: GRANTING MTN FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.