Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Duncan, Livia filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Administration Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY & CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - KELLIE HARRIS | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - CHARLES J. SLAGGY JR | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.