Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilmington Trust National Association Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee For Mfra Trust 2015-1, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Tromberg, Andrea, Weinstein, Stephen Michael, Valiathodathil, Princy, against Valentino, Therese P, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWEET, GARY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property/Mort Forecl-Nonhome $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
NOTICE OF SERVING
Date: February 17, 2022PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 AS TO THERESE P VALENTINO:
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS:
Date: October 23, 2020PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1:
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE OF FILING:
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS:
Date: October 23, 2020PAYMENT $945.00 RECEIPT #200033007
Date: October 27, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RETURNED FROM OFFICIAL RECORDS: BOOK 3469 PAGE 2269
Date: October 30, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT:
Date: November 12, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 23, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE - UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 11/7/2020 7:46AM (SUMMONS ATTACHED):
Date: November 11, 2020COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE:
Date: October 23, 2020COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED THERESE P VALENTINO 11/7/2020 7:46AM (SUMMONS ATTACHED):
Date: November 11, 2020ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12.2.21 AT 9:30 AM; SIGNED 10.20.21:
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10.20.21 AT 9:30 AM; SIGNED 7.15.21:
Date: July 16, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: July 19, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME AND E-SERVICE ADDRESS
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT:
Date: October 22, 2021COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2021ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SIGNED 12.02.2021; RE-SET TO 02.16.2022 AT 9:30 AM
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT:
Date: December 03, 2021VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY- KYLE MELANSON FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 25, 2020PAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #220029913
Date: September 30, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 29, 2022ORDER PLACING CASE ON ACTIVE STATUS; SIGNED 7.11.22:
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 29, 2022PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS:
Date: January 18, 2022ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- SIGNED 2.16.22:
Date: February 16, 2022MOTION TO PLACE CASE ON ACTIVE STATUS:
Date: March 26, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED DEFAULT AS TO THERESE P VALENTINO:
Date: March 30, 2022DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST THERESE P VALENTINO- RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA EPORTAL:
Date: March 31, 2022VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS- THERESE P VALENTINO:
Date: March 30, 2022COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RETURNED FROM OFFICIAL RECORDS BK 3339 PG 685: | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #220029913 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTES: COPY OF NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS SEND TO OFFICIAL RECORDS TO BE RECORDED ALONG WITH $18.50 RECEIPT | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER PLACING CASE ON ACTIVE STATUS; SIGNED 7.11.22: | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES - 07.06.2022 AT 9:00 AM ON PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO PLACE CASE ON ACTIVE STATUS | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 07/06/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN A3-1 , JDG: SWEET, GARY L | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 07.06.2022 AT 9:00 AM ON PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO PLACE CASE ON ACTIVE STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.