Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association As Trustee For Abfc 2005-Opt1 Trust Abfc Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-Opt1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Van Ness, John Anthony, against Mccaskill, Blake, Mccaskill, Kammy L, represented by Adams, Holli E, Friedman, David A, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWEET, GARY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property/Mor Forec-Homestead $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF SETING ZOOM MEDIATION 1.20.22:
Date: December 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS:
Date: October 29, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET:
Date: October 22, 2020CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO FLA.STAT. 702-015(4):
Date: October 22, 2020VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE:
Date: October 22, 2020VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM:
Date: October 22, 2020PAYMENT $934.00 RECEIPT #200032709
Date: October 23, 2020DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: 02.03.2021 AT 9:00 AM
Date: February 02, 2021DEFENDANTS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION:
Date: June 09, 2021PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 FOR BLAKE MCCASKILL:
Date: October 22, 2020PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 FOR KAMMY L. MCCASKILL:
Date: October 22, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAMMY L MCCASKILL; BLAKE MCCASKILL-RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA EPORTAL:
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 26, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS:
Date: October 22, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RETURNED FROM OFFICIAL RECORDS: BOOK 3171 PAGE 1747
Date: November 05, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED - SUMMONS SERVED ON BLAKE MCCASKILL ON 11.10.2020 AT 9:57AM:
Date: November 12, 2020DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: February 22, 2021DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 05, 2021DEFENDANTS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FROM PLAINTIFF:
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF:
Date: June 09, 2021PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 15, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING DISCOVERY RESPONSES:
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF FILING E-FILED COPY OF NOTE & MORTGAGE
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL- EFFECTIVE OCTOBER 1, 2021:
Date: October 28, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE:
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OR READINESS TO SET NON-JURY TRIAL:
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEE
Date: October 29, 2021ATTORNEY'S FLAT FEE AFFIDAVIT:
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF FILING -PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT AS TO NOTICE OF INTENTION TO FORECLOSE (ATTACHED):
Date: November 23, 2021LETTER TO CLERK FROM IAN D. JAGENDORF, ESQ. DATED 10.29.21:
Date: November 02, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTING ZOOM MEDIATION:02.17.2022
Date: January 23, 2022MOTION TO ALLOW WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS:
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: November 02, 2021PLAINTIFF’S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST:
Date: March 23, 2022TELEPHONIC NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 2/3/2021 @ 9:00 AM- DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: December 30, 2020LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY DATED 11.29.22
Date: December 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CLERK
Date: December 01, 2022SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY- KAMMY MCCASKILL
Date: October 03, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: November 01, 2022PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #220030165
Date: October 03, 2022LETTER FROM VAN NESS LAW FIRM - ELECTRONIC SALE FEE
Date: September 30, 2022PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #220026334
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 29, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF SALE:
Date: September 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT LIST-PLAINTIFF
Date: August 16, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; SIGNED 08/16/2022
Date: August 16, 2022SWORN WITNESS LIST:
Date: August 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF VERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS (NON-JURY TRIAL 08/16/2022)
Date: August 11, 2022COURT MINUTES - 08/16/2022 AT 9:30 AM ON NJT
Date: August 16, 2022PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF SERVING TRIAL EXHIBITS:
Date: May 06, 2022COURT MINUTES - 4.14.22 AT 9:00 AM DOCKET CALL
Date: April 14, 2022ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON JURY TRIAL ON 08/16/2022 AT 9:30 AM; SIGNED 04.18.2022
Date: April 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON -JURY TRIAL
Date: April 21, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- ORDER:
Date: April 13, 2022CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SIGNED ORDER - GENERAL TRACK
Date: November 04, 2021CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND PROPOSED ORDER - GENERAL TRACK
Date: September 21, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTING ZOOM MEDIATION
Date: January 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:
Date: January 24, 2022MEDIATOR REPORT - NO AGREEMENT
Date: February 17, 2022DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO CANCEL TRIAL OR,IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING 4.14.22 AT 9:00 AM MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS
Date: March 24, 2022ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR DOCKET CALL ON APRIL 14, 2022; SIGNED 03.30.2022
Date: March 31, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING:
Date: March 31, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 4.14.22 AT 9:00 AM:
Date: March 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY DATED 11.29.22 | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS AND RELEASING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS; SIGNED 11.15.22 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTES: ATTORNEY NEEDS TO PROVIDE SELF ADDRESSED SELF STAMPED ENVELOPE FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY- KAMMY MCCASKILL | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #220030165 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM VAN NESS LAW FIRM - ELECTRONIC SALE FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.