Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mangan, John J Jr filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with MIRMAN, LAWRENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMIRMAN, LAWRENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryFormal Administration Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED (DATE) ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 4/22/2021 12:16 PM / INSTRUMENT #: 2883450 BOOK#:3217 PAGE#: 2577) | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 4/21/2021 4:58 PM / INSTRUMENT #: 2883236 BOOK#:3217 PAGE#: 1657) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED (DATE) ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY & CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - LINDA S. SIMBRITZ | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED INVENTORY | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE, RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY & CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - ALBERT H. SIMBRITZ | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.