Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kibbey, Richard D, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Barlow, Richard, against Kibbey Wagner Pllc, Wagner, Barbara, Wagner, Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil-Business Transactions |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:
Date: October 12, 2020COMPLAINT:
Date: October 12, 2020NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES- JORDAN WAGNER:
Date: October 12, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BARBARA WAGNER:
Date: October 12, 2020NOTICE OF FILING TERMINATION OF TENANTS
Date: October 12, 2020PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #200031531
Date: October 14, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO- JORDAN WAGNER & KIBBEY WAGNER PLLC-E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:
Date: October 15, 2020ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: SIGNED 10.23.2020
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL (OR BOOK/PAGE 3235/495)
Date: October 23, 2020ORDER OF RECUSAL; SIGNED 10.20.2020
Date: October 20, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET:
Date: October 12, 2020DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516:
Date: October 12, 2020NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES- BARBARA WAGNER:
Date: October 12, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS JORDAN WAGNER:
Date: October 12, 2020PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- JORDAN WAGNER
Date: October 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: SIGNED 10.23.2020 | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL (OR BOOK/PAGE 3235/495) | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF RECUSAL; SIGNED 10.20.2020 | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO- JORDAN WAGNER & KIBBEY WAGNER PLLC-E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY: | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #200031531 | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | EPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00 | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00 | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 20000903CAAXMX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.