Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roselio, As Natural Parent And Natural Guardian Of J.I., Jessica, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Naparstek, Matthew Ryan, against Bloomin Brands Inc, Carrabbas Italian Grill Llc, Osi Restaurant Partners Llc, Park And Shop Of Florida Inc, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with METZGER, ELIZABETH A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryNegligence-Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
UNOPPOSED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: March 02, 2022DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 07, 2021RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM:
Date: September 27, 2021RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. LALIT CHAUBE ON 09/28/2021
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES:
Date: March 04, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO RECORDED DEPOSITION- AMANDA BUFORD:
Date: April 08, 2021CERTIFICATION IN COMPLIANCE BY DEFENDANT:
Date: June 01, 2021PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #200031321
Date: October 14, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO F.S. §768.79 AND FLA. R. CIV.P. 1.442
Date: November 18, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT BLOOMIN' BRANDS INC:
Date: October 13, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UPON BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC ON 10.16.2020; SUMMONS ATTACHED
Date: October 26, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET:
Date: October 13, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO RECORDED DEPOSITION OF AMBER BUFORD 7.14.21:
Date: July 07, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 23, 20204TH RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JESSICA ROSELIO 4.7.2021:
Date: March 31, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:
Date: October 13, 20203RD RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PF JESSICA ROSELIO ON 04.14.2021
Date: March 08, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JOSEPH J. IGNELZI AND JESSICA ROSELIO ON 01.11.2021
Date: November 23, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. LALIT CHAUBE 8.10.21:
Date: July 20, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 23, 2020DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION:
Date: May 25, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT OSI RESTAURANT PARTNERS LLC:
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER TO SUBMIT AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER; SIGNED 11.04.2021
Date: November 05, 2021DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: November 30, 2020PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 29, 2020RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JESSICA ROSELIO 3.9.2021:
Date: February 05, 2021DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: January 07, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UPON SHOP OF FLORIDA, INC ON 10.19.2020; SUMMONS ATTACHED
Date: October 26, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 23, 2020PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 05, 2021DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: December 21, 2020DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE BY DEFENDANT
Date: January 04, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 28, 2021COMPLAINT:
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JOSEPH IGNELZI ON 04.13.2021
Date: March 02, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT BLOOMIN' BRANDS INC:
Date: October 13, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO RECORDED DEPOSITION OF AMBER BUFORD 7.14.21:
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT OSI RESTAURANT PARTNERS LLC:
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PARK AND SHOP OF FLORIDA INC:
Date: October 13, 2020PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- BLOOMIN' BRANDS INC:
Date: October 13, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UPON OSI RESTAURANT PARTNERS LLC ON 10.16.2020; SUMMONS ATTACHED
Date: October 26, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL LLC:
Date: October 13, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT PARK AND SHOP OF FLORIDA INC:
Date: October 13, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL LLC:
Date: October 13, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UPON CARABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL, LLC ON 10.16.2020; SUMMONS ATTACHED
Date: October 26, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 05, 2021PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: January 31, 2023GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT:
Date: June 01, 2022PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT
Date: May 18, 2022AGREED ORDER ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT; SIGNED 6.8.22:
Date: June 08, 2022AGREED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SIGNED ORDER - GENERAL TRACK
Date: November 23, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: EDUARDO COSIO, ESQ.
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CLOSING PLEADING OR PROPOSED FINAL ORDER WITHIN 30 DAYS; SIGNED 01/30/2023 | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT; SIGNED 6.8.22: | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT: | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | UNOPPOSED ORDER APPROVING IAN BRESSLER, ESQ AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF J.I. A MINOR; SIGNED 03.14.2022 | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | UNOPPOSED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SIGNED ORDER - GENERAL TRACK | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER - GENERAL TRACK- ORDER SIGNED 11.23.21: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.