Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Debski, Michael Thiel, against Anderson, Deidrah, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with WATERS, JENNIFER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SIGNED ORDER - GENERAL TRACK | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - FILED IN INCORRECT COUNTY - BELONGS IN JACKSON COUNTY, NOT MARTIN: | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - DEIDRAH ANDERSON- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY: | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE TO ATTORNEY: | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE RESPONSE FROM ATTORNEY- ACCEPTED: | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET : | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 432019CA000063CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/16/2019 | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- DEIDRAH ANDERSON: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.