Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Centerstate Bank Of Florida Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Vanvalkenburgh, Jessica, against Sports Quest Inc, Young, H Stephen, represented by Turnbull, W Scott, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with BARBARA BRONIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY REQUEST RECEIVED-CERTIFIED COPY SENT TO OFFICIAL RECORDS 5.23.16: | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES 4.28.16 8:30AM- UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR- MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT- GRANTED: | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT-4.28.16 BOOK: 2853 PAGE: 1019 | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 4/28/2016 0830 AM Judge BARBARA BRONIS results DISPOSED on 4/28/2016 | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING -4.28.16 @ 8:30 AM -MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JESSICA VANVALKENBURGH ESQ RE: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY DATED 4.4.16: | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/28/2016 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge BARBARA BRONIS presiding. | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING -1. ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE DATED DECEMBER 26, 2014 2. ORIGINAL COMMERCIAL GUARANTY TO PROMISSORY NOTE DATED DECEMBER 26, 2014.3 . ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE DATED OCTOBER 12, 2012.4. ORIGINAL COMMERCIAL GUARANTY TO PROMISSORY NOTE DATED OCTOBER 12, 2012.5. AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF.6. AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES.7. AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.