Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martin Medical Center, Ascensionpoint Recovery Services Llc Citibank, Incremona, Jennine M, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with MIRMAN, LAWRENCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2013 |
CategorySummary Administration Less Than 1000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM: ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY: $413.24 | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | ESTATE CLAIM FOR $413.24/ ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES FOR GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK: | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM: MARTIN MEDICAL CENTER: $54,980.98 | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ESTATE CLAIM FOR $54,980.98: MARTIN MEDICAL CENTER | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM: ASCENSION RECOVERY SERVICES: $1,894.00 | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | ESTATE CLAIM FOR $1,894.00: ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY SERVICES - CITIBANK MASTERCARD: | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | COPY REQUEST RECEIVED & PROCESSED 09.06.13 | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | RECORDED DOCUMENTS | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | COPY REQUEST RECEIVED & PROCESSED 08.26.13 | |
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE S/LM 8.13.13: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.