Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Berrios, Jasmine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dennison, Lamar, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with BASS, JENNIFER LESTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Active Process DOMESTIC VIOLENCE disposition on 03/01/2024 | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 422024DR000719DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 02/29/2024 | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: BASS , JENNIFER Assigned | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FOR SERVING RSPT | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.