Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lassiter, Whitney Lauren, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cockrell, Steven Reid, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ANN CRAGGS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANN CRAGGS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event INJUNCTION HRG on 09/29/2022 0830 AM - CONTINUED | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Event INJUNCTION HRG scheduled on 10/13/2022 at 0830 AM - Judge ANN CRAGGS presiding. | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Active Process DOMESTIC VIOLENCE disposition on 09/21/2022 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO CITRUS COUNTY SHERIFF IN REF TO SERVICE | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: CRAGGS , ANN MELINDA assigned | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 422022DR003167DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 09/20/2022 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.