Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Callahan, Scott, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Smith, Phillip Stuart, against Grace, Angela, represented by Landt, Mary Catherine, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
This complaint, filed in the Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Marion County, Florida, is a motion to strike the plaintiff's verification of the verified complaint. The defendant, Angela Grace, argues that the plaintiff, Scott Callahan, ...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 07, 2021PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: May 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT ANGELA GRACE
Date: June 02, 2021EFILED SUMMONS
Date: May 07, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT ANGELA GRACE
Date: June 02, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 10, 2021ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT ANGELA GRACE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT ANGELA GRACE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS VERIFICATION OF VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT ANGELA GRACE | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $495.00 Receipt Number XX 635821 | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 422021CA000849CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/7/2021 | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.