Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ferrell, Phillip D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bishop, Raven C., in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with JERALD, R. GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJERALD, R. GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL JUDGMENT PERMITTING RELOCATION OF MOTHER WITHOUT CHILD AND MODIFYING TIMESHARING | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopen CIVIL MODIFICATIONS closed on 04/06/2023 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 7 assessed at sum $3.60 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $3.60 Receipt Number XX 838801 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF: VERIFICATION OF EMPLOYMENT FOR RAVEN | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF: ACCEPTANCE LETTER FOR DAYCARE | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL STATEMENT FOR RAVEN BISHOP | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL STATEMENT FROM PHILLIP FERRELL | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING ON 04/03/23 AT 100 PM VIA ZOOM | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC HEARING ON TUES MARCH 14 2023 AT 930 VIA ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.