Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brown, Timothy S., against Miriam Camacho, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time419 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. ERICA L BRACHFELD SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AND IS REPLACED BY TIMOTHY S. BROWN Not Applicable |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF NAME FILED ON BEHALF OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Not Applicable |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO NAME CHANGE OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FILED ON BEHALF OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Not Applicable |
|
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF VACATED |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES Not Applicable |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 02/22/10 Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.