Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lydting, Alexandra, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Smith, Michael James, against Smith, Ryan Andrew, represented by Smith, Ashleigh Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROGERS, STEVEN GLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
EFILED SUMMONS
Date: January 18, 2021EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE
Date: January 21, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT RYAN ADREW SMITH SUB SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILD BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: June 21, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: August 25, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: November 17, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: December 13, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: December 13, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: January 10, 2022DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 18, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 18, 2021PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: January 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 18, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 18, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 18, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: May 17, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: June 04, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILD BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: June 21, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS REPORT
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: June 29, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: October 18, 2021REPLY FILED BY ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: July 23, 2021NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: July 30, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: August 24, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY ALEXANDRIA LYDTING
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: October 05, 2021ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER
Date: October 26, 2021NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: October 25, 2021STIPULATION TO SET PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: February 18, 2022ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: November 12, 2021NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: December 01, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF ALEXANDRA LYDTING FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH
Date: December 13, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: March 07, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLTFS REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH
Date: March 18, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING
Date: February 25, 2022MEDIATION REPORT
Date: March 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF ALEXANDRA LYDTING | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLTFS REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT RYAN A SMITH | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RYAN ANDREW SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.