Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hopkins, Dora, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Logan, Athena, Logan, Susha, represented by Andrews, Elizabeth Eileen, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 21, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT SUSHA LOGAN
Date: February 03, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 20, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS
Date: April 03, 2020PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS
Date: April 03, 2020EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS ATHENA LOGAN AND SUSHA LOGAN
Date: December 23, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS ATHENA LOGAN AND SUSHA LOGAN
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT CONT SEE DOC
Date: January 13, 2020ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT ATHENA LOGAN
Date: February 03, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS ATHEN LOGAN AND SUSHA LOGAN
Date: February 17, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS
Date: March 03, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT-CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS
Date: March 25, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS ATHEN LOGAN AND SUSHA LOGAN
Date: February 17, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS ATHEN LOGAN AND SUSHA LOGAN
Date: February 17, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT ATHENA LOGAN AND SUSHA LOGAN
Date: March 31, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: April 01, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY DEFTS ATHENA LOGAN and SUSHA LOGAN
Date: March 31, 2020ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS
Date: April 03, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 08, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS
Date: May 08, 2020FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT ATHENA LOGAN AND SUSHA LOGAN | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY DEFTS ATHENA LOGAN and SUSHA LOGAN | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT-CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF DORA HOPKINS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.