Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Frantz, John Ray, Frantz, Marlowe A, Unknown Parties In Possession, Unknown Spouse Of Marlowe A Fr, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 19, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2019RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: November 19, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 19, 2019NOTICE
Date: November 19, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: November 19, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 19, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 19, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 20, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2
Date: December 03, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JOHN RAY FRANTZ
Date: December 04, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1
Date: December 04, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARLOWE A FRANTZ
Date: December 21, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR MARLOWE A FRANTZ
Date: December 21, 2019EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: January 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: January 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: January 08, 2020CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFAULT NOT ENTERED
Date: March 20, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: January 28, 2021DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK FILED BY PLTF: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA
Date: January 10, 2020NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS/ATTORNEY COPY
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: February 04, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: March 11, 2020EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 01, 2021EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: March 16, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: March 16, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: March 20, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: February 09, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: March 02, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: March 04, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: March 04, 2021NOTICE OF FILING MORTGAGE FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: March 04, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING
Date: March 08, 2021ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING
Date: March 08, 2021NOTICE OF DISAGREEMENT WITH CONFIDENTIAL FILING
Date: March 09, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 23, 2021CLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2021NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST
Date: April 06, 2021CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE:
Date: April 20, 2021EFILED NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 29, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 25, 2021ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: June 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: June 08, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: June 14, 2021CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTF ATTORNEY RE DISBURSEMENT CHECK
Date: June 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: June 21, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: June 21, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: June 29, 2021COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTF ATTORNEY RE DISBURSEMENT CHECK | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM FILED BY PLTF WELLS FARGO BANK NA | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 assessed at sum $6.00 | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $62,970.42 Receipt Number XX 644700 | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.