Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ibm Southeast Employees Credit, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Cohen, Marc B, against Sinclair, Errol, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by IBM Southeast Employees' Credit Union against the defendant, Errol Sinclair, in the Circuit Court of the 5th Judicial Circuit in Marion County, Florida. The complaint consists of two counts seeking damages exceeding $15,000...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 13, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 13, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 13, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 14, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ERROL SINCLAIR
Date: November 27, 2019EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: December 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF IBM SOUTHEAST EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION
Date: December 26, 2019DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: December 31, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER- ACTION TO COUNTY COURT FILED BY PLTF IBM SOUTHEAST EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF IBM SOUTHEAST EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ERROL SINCLAIR | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ERROL SINCLAIR | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.