Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Maier, Heidi, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case represented by Ferro, Henry George, against School Board Of Marion County, represented by Adel, Garry D, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Steven G. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Heidi Maier, the elected Superintendent of Marion County Schools, against the School Board of Marion County, Florida. The complaint alleges that the School Board has engaged in political overreach and interference in the Su...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 12, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: February 25, 2020PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 14, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 13, 2019ANSWER FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA
Date: January 10, 2020MEDIATION REPORT
Date: March 05, 2020CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE:
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT MARION COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD FILED BY PLTF DR HEIDI MAIER EDD | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE-NOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND READY TO BE SET FOR TRIAL FILED BY PLTFS HEIDI F MAIER ED D AND HENRY G FERRO | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY DEFT SCHOOL BOARD OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 483342 | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.