Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lavin, Desiree Maria, against Apfelbaum, Alan J, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Alan J Apfelbaum. Bank of America is a national banking association based in Charlotte, North Carolina. The defendant applied for and received a credit account from the plaintiff, which was sub...
PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: October 28, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL-NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 28, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA
Date: January 09, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 28, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: October 28, 2019NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING
Date: October 28, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: October 29, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: December 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL-NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 422019CA002375CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2019 | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 478216 | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.