Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Galipault, Joanne Mary, against Rodriguez, Madeline J, Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries De, Unknown Tenant In Possessionof, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Forecl $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 10, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: October 10, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: October 10, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: October 10, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: October 11, 2019RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: October 10, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES
Date: December 04, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 10, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: October 10, 2019RECEIPT
Date: December 09, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: November 19, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT MADELINE J RODRIGUEZ
Date: December 04, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: December 04, 2019CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE
Date: December 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $2.00 | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $21.50 Receipt Number XX 490261 | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $1.50 | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $18.50 | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT MADELINE J RODRIGUEZ | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.