Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Santiago, Jesus, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smith, Michael James, against Herlong, Michael Owens, represented by Wright, Virgil William, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal action filed by Jesus Santiago against Michael Owens Herlong. The complaint alleges that on May 12, 2017, Santiago was operating a motor vehicle traveling west on State Road 40 in Marion County, Florida, while Herlong owned ...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 08, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: October 08, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 08, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: October 08, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: October 08, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: November 20, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 08, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFENDANT HERLONG
Date: December 11, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: October 08, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: October 08, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MIHCAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: October 15, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: November 01, 2019REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: November 08, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE
Date: November 06, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: December 20, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: December 17, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 20, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: December 17, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: December 17, 2019REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: December 23, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: May 27, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 24, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: February 06, 2020NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: February 07, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 13, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 15, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: July 17, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: May 15, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: May 15, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: September 29, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 21, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: May 28, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: October 05, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: May 29, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: October 23, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: June 01, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: July 09, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF
Date: July 16, 2020NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: November 23, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: July 20, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY
Date: September 25, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: October 06, 2020NOTICE-NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: October 29, 2020ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER
Date: November 04, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG
Date: November 24, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO
Date: March 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO PLTFS NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWNES HERLONG | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE-NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL OWENS HERLONG | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF JESUS SANTIAGO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.