Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gonzalez, Miguel Antonio, against Burns, Karen G, Pine Run Residents Association, Unknown Spouse Of Karen G Burn, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2019RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: December 30, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: December 30, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2019MOTION-MOTION TO STAY CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES
Date: March 27, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT PINE RUN RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION INC
Date: February 12, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KAREN G BURNS
Date: February 12, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY/ABATE FORECLOSURE ACTION-CONT SEE DOC
Date: May 06, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREN G BURNS
Date: February 12, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: May 08, 2020CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FILED BY PLTF ATTORNEY
Date: May 22, 2020NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: November 08, 2021REPORT-STATUS REPORT TO COURT FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: June 01, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO ABATE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: September 21, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO STAY CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: March 16, 2021REPORT CASE MANAGEMENT FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: August 18, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 10, 2021NOTICE OF FILING FILED PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREN G BURNS AKA KAREN BURNS
Date: October 04, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: October 04, 2021DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: October 13, 2021CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE
Date: October 29, 2021ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: October 26, 2021DISAGREEMENT ON NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 17, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE FOR KAREN BURNS AKA KAREN G BURNS
Date: December 08, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KAREN BURNS
Date: December 08, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: December 29, 2021MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE
Date: January 12, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: January 11, 2022CLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2022NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST
Date: January 18, 2022EFILED NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC
Date: January 18, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 08, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: February 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED
Date: March 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: February 21, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: March 04, 2022COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED
Date: March 11, 2022CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTFS ATTORNEY RE DISBURSEMENT CHECK
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY FORECLOSURE SALE PURCHASER BRIGHTLITE HOMES 1 LLC | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 03/15/2022 | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLTFS ATTORNEY RE DISBURSEMENT CHECK | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 assessed at sum $6.00 | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $127,867.42 Receipt Number XX 718891 | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.