Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Meb Loan Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rosaler, Brian Lee, against Ocana, Eduardo, Ocana, Luis, The Marion Oaks Civic Associat, Unknown Spouse Of Eduardo Ocan, Unknown Spouse Of Luis Ocana, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 07, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 27, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2019RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: December 27, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 27, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: December 27, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 27, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT EDUARDO OCANA
Date: January 09, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 NKA SASHA OCANO
Date: January 09, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MARION OAKS CIVIC ASSOCIATION
Date: January 14, 2020RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT EDUARDO OCANA
Date: January 17, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT LUIS OCANA
Date: February 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: February 06, 2020EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 06, 2020EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: February 11, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: February 06, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: February 11, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: February 14, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 1 NKA SASHA OCANA
Date: February 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: March 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: March 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED PER PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY
Date: March 06, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: March 06, 2020PROMISSORY NOTE - ORIGINAL AND COPY OF MORTGAGE -ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 10, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY DEFT EUDARDO OCANA
Date: March 12, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR MEDIATION FILED BY DEFT EDUARDO OCANA
Date: March 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: March 13, 2020MOTION-AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 01, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: April 03, 2020ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION-CONT SEE DOC
Date: April 16, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT EUDARDO OCANA
Date: May 27, 2020REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF FILED BY DEFT EDUARDO OCANA
Date: May 27, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR WAIVER OF MEDIATION FEES FILED BY DEFT EDUARDO OCANA
Date: May 28, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: June 02, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: June 18, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: June 02, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO DISPENSE WITH MEDIATION FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: June 19, 2020REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: June 25, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: July 01, 2020DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: July 08, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF ALL DEADLINES FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: July 08, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 06, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: July 08, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: July 08, 2020NOTICE-NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: July 08, 2020CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE
Date: July 28, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLEADINGS FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST
Date: August 04, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL TRUST ASSOCIATION
Date: August 18, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL
Date: November 20, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF FILED ON NOVEMBER 20 2020
Date: January 04, 2021MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT RABBI YOSEF KONIKOV
Date: August 20, 2021CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL CONT SEE DOC
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY RE ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE RETURNED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL CONT SEE DOC | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT RABBI YOSEF KONIKOV | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: MUSLEH , VICTOR J Assigned | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AO 2021-29 CIVIL BACKLOG DOCKET CASE REASSIGNED TO SENIOR JUDGE - JUDGE MUSLEH | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF FILED ON NOVEMBER 20 2020 | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF US BANK NATIONAL TRUST ASSOCIATION | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLEADINGS FILED BY PLTF MEB LOAN TRUST | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.