Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
United Specialty Insurance Com, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Avrutis, Thomas Lee, against Village Discount Golf Car Llc, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROGERS, STEVEN GLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 21, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 21, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 23, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VILLAGE DISCOUNT GOLF CAR LLC
Date: January 23, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VILLAGE DISCOUNT GOLF CAR LLC | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 494314 | |
December 21, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 21, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
December 21, 2019 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
December 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 422019CA002765CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/21/2019 | |
December 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.