Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Scruggs, Christina, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Weisser, Kevin Joshua, against Avatar Property And Casualty I, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Steven G. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven G. Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 20, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 20, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 20, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 20, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 20, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 20, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 28, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CHRISTINA SCRUGGS
Date: December 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CHRISTINA SCRUGGS | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE | |
March 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY FILED BY DEFT AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.