Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcmasters, Cody, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Toth, Adrienn Nikolett, against Spell, Randy Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 16, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: January 17, 2020PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 16, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 16, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 16, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: January 24, 2020EFILED SUMMONS
Date: December 16, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 17, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: January 17, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: January 24, 2020REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: February 06, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: January 24, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: February 11, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: January 28, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: February 11, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION
Date: January 31, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: February 11, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA
Date: February 20, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFT
Date: July 01, 2020DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: August 21, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 06, 2020NOTICE-NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: September 24, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 10, 2020NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTIO OF COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: February 24, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: February 27, 2020NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION
Date: October 08, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM MULTIPLE CONT SEE DOC
Date: March 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: March 13, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 13, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: March 16, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: April 22, 2020NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: April 22, 2020NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: May 06, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: June 22, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 07, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: July 14, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: October 15, 2020MOTION-STIPULATION SETTING TRIAL PERIOD
Date: November 16, 2020ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Date: December 03, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: December 09, 2020WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 16, 2020CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: February 08, 2021PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: March 04, 2021MEDIATION REPORT
Date: February 19, 2021MEDIATION REPORT
Date: February 16, 2021WITNESS DISCLOSURE PLTF EXPERT
Date: March 04, 2021WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: March 23, 2021EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL
Date: April 05, 2021NOTICE-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: May 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PLTF CODY MCMASTERS | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | WITNESS DISCLOSURE PLTF EXPERT | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO CODY MCMASTERS FILED BY DEFT RANDY GLENN SPELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.