Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Rick Wang, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with DIANA L MORELAND presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2024 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 1253346 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Compliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 4/11/2024 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF DEATH- DEYAN HOU | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Compliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 4/10/2024 - id number 2653377 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00 AssessmentID 12274131 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT- RUO QUAN WANG | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Case 412024CP000900CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 4/9/2024 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.