Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Matzen, Neill Frank, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Renee C. Day presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Name Change |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - PLAINTIFF Date: 12/06/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 1
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (CIVIL) MOTIOIN FOR RECONSIDERATION WITH DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of NEILL FRANK MATZEN (PETITIONER) |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A TROTTER: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME Date: 05/17/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: DAY, RENEE C. Location: DEPT 2 NO APPEARANCES, NO PROOF OF PUBLICATION, NOTICE WAS NOT SENT TO WARDEN. CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judge: DAY, RENEE C. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT FROM NEILL FRANK MATZEN INFORMING COURT OF HIS EFFORTS TO HAVE THE PROOF OF PUBLICATION COMPLETED AND RETURNED. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of NEILL FRANK MATZEN (PETITIONER) | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CLETS REPORT RECEIVED FROM SHERIFF AND FILED | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME Date: 05/17/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 1
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER GRANTED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) NEILL FRANK MATZEN (PETITIONER); | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of NEILL FRANK MATZEN (PETITIONER) | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CLETS REPORT TO SHERIFF ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.