Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Butler County C And Y, The State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Harry Harold King Iv, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with KEVIN BRUNING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance Type NDD LETTER SENT was satisfied with Compliance Action - EVIDENCE DESTROYED set on 11/2/2021 | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF OR DESTROY EXHIBITS/EVIDENCE | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance Type EVIDENCE RETENTION was satisfied with Compliance Action - NDD LETER SENT - EVIDENCE set on 9/1/2021 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance NDD LETTER SENT has been created with due date of 10/1/2021 - id number 2275494 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PREP SHEET FOR NEW DEPOSITORY CASE | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER OF SUPPORT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Compliance EVIDENCE RETENTION has been created with due date of 8/5/2021 - id number 2232176 | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CLERK AND COURT DOCKET FILED IN OPEN COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.