Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Clifford Baskin Jr, Sabrina Hill Baskin, filed a(n) case represented by Reyhana Ammara Khan, against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Maggie Eileen Potter, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED DISCOVERY | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS MAGGIE E. POTTER, ESQ OBO UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.