Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ruth Mcdaniel, filed a(n) case represented by Jason William Imler, Patrice Anne Pucci, against Manatee County Board Of Commissioners, Manatee County, represented by Douglas Eugene Polk Jr, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with EDWARD NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL - JASON IMLER OBO PLAINTIFF | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL JASON IMLER, ESQ. OF IMLER LAW OBO RUTH MCDANIEL | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL - EXHIBITS A PLAINTIFF'S APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL - EXHIBIT B - PROPOSED ORDER | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS JASON W IMLER ESQ OBO RUTH MCDANIEL, | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, MANATEE COUNTY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 AssessmentID 11742689 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.