Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Randy Folk, filed a(n) case represented by M David Shapiro, against Elizabeth Wyble, represented by Joshua Matthew Pomerantz, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Randy Folk against Elizabeth Wyble in the Circuit Court of the Twelfth Judicial Circuit in Manatee County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000.00, excluding interest and costs. The incident in question...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 14, 2021NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - NOVEMBER 3 2021 1O:OOAM CANCELLED | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FIRST NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING - NOVEMBER 3 2021 1OAM VIA ZOOM | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM 11/3/2021 AT 10:00 AM - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS 2ND NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - RANDY FOLK SEPTEMBER 27 2021 1OAM VIA ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.