Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
James Moore, Sandra Moore, filed a(n) case represented by Grant William Krapf, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Mark Andrew Sodhi, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by James Moore and Sandra Moore against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Twelfth Judicial Circuit in Manatee County, Florida. The plaintiffs allege that they are residents of Florida and the defen...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIDEO AND STENOGRAPHIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM TONY ROBERTS NOVEMBER 9, 2021 | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS PRIVILEGE LOG | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO AND STENOGRAPHIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA ZOOM TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY, TUESDAY NOVEMBER 9, 2021 AT 1:00 P.M. | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES WITH EXHIBITS A- EMAILED CORRESPONDENCE FROM QUINTAIROS PRIETO | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, SANDRA MOORE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.