Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with Deno G. Economou presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Compliance Type NCI - FILED was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 3/28/2019 | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF CATHERINE HOYT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (TESTATE) - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF EX-PARTE HEARING - 19TH DAY OF FEBRUARY, 2019, AT 9:30 A.M., - SUBJECT: PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY AND FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EX-PARTE HEARING - 19TH DAY OF FEBRUARY, 2019, AT 9:30 A.M., - SUBLECT: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received:Receipt Number C 689837 | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Compliance NCI - FILED has been created with due date of 2/12/2019 | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Compliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/11/2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.