Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Vought, Brittany G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Solomon, Francesa, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with E BROWNING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeE BROWNING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RECEIPT | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION INJUNCTION | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 7/20/2023 0900 AM Judge E BROWNING III results Disposed on 7/20/2023 | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process TEMPORARY ORDER & SCHEDULING HEARING | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF FL D.L. | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DOMESTIC INJUNCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.