Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
French, Sharon B, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against French, Joshua David, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RECEIPT | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 6/22/2023 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 6/23/2023 | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 402023DR000094DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/9/2023 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF FL D.L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.