Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mcintyre, Mashady, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcintyre, Andjuan Sr, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with DOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOUGLAS, WESLEY RAYMOND Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 10/3/2023 1100 AM Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS results Disposed on 10/12/2023 | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLTUIN OF MARRIAGE | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S NTC OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 10/3/2023 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT ENTERED | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ANDJUAN MCINTYRE SR | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: DOUGLAS , WESLEY R Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.