Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Britt, Bobby M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Britt, Taresa L, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/8/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding. | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 402023DR000083DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/5/2023 | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NOT ISSUED | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.