Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Department Of Children And Fam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcghee, Anthony Jr, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with E BROWNING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeE BROWNING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RECEIPT | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL INJUNCTION TO PREVENT CHILD ABUSE OR DV | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 5/4/2023 1000 AM Judge E BROWNING III results Disposed on 5/4/2023 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RECEIPT | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process TEMPORARY ORDER & SCHEDULING HEARING | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 5/4/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.