Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Barfield, Brittany Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Eastabrooks, David Frederick, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with MELISSA OLIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMELISSA OLIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S MOT TO DISQUALIFY | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 11/6/2023 0900 AM Judge E BROWNING III results Disposed on 11/6/2023 | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RECEIPT | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/3/2023 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding. | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOT FOR CONTINUANCE | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA TO ASHLEY HERN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.