Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Gwendol, Hall, Gwendolyn L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schneider, Pamela A, against Hall, Leroy Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF SUPPORT | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK MINUTES | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIDEO CONFERCING OR TELEPHONE (WITH NOTARY PRESENT) TITLE IV-D DOCKET | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 7/11/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge OFFICER HEARING presiding. | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 402023DR000067DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/13/2023 | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.