Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gabriel, Debora, Gabriel, Patrick, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts with E BROWNING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeE BROWNING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 4/24/2023 1030 AM Judge E BROWNING III results Disposed on 4/24/2023 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/24/2023 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding. | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY assigned | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 402023DR000059DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/5/2023 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S COPY OF FL D.L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.