Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Broomfield, Serena Charvette, Fl Dept Of Revenue Obo Serena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schneider, Pamela A, against Ellison, Terrance Lamonte Sr, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, FL, . Madison County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF SERVICE NON SERVED | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS | |
November 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF NON-SERVICE | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 402023DR000057DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2023 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, CHILD SUPPORT AND FOR OTHER RELIEF | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.